CO HB1060 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the establishment of contribution limits under the "Fair Campaign Practices Act" for candidates for school district director, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Contribution Limits School Dist Dir Candidate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1060 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1060 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1060 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1060 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1060 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1060 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2022-04-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2022-02-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-31 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-01-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |