CO HB1056 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the eligibility of a veterans' service organization to accept public service assignments offered in connection with misdemeanor sentencing.
Title
Criminal Sentencing Community Service Veterans Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1056 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be place on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1056 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be place on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/01/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-01-26 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |