CO HB1052 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the inclusion of pumped hydroelectric energy generation in the definition of "eligible energy resources" for purposes of meeting Colorado's renewable energy standard.
Title
Define Pumped Hydroelectricity As Renewable Energy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1052 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1052 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2021-03-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |