CO HB1050 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the distribution of drugs by other outlet pharmacies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Other Outlet Pharmacies Drug Distribution

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24 Governor Signed
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-09SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-04SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2020-02-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-01-24HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1050
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1050_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1050_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1050_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1050_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1050_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1050_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d35c2c44e10e2cd2872584f900635acb-hb20-1050-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d35c2c44e10e2cd2872584f900635acb-hb20-1050-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1050vote5c1dd4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/962286b597b68f1f8725852100635ec0-hb20-1050-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1050vote5bba64

Bill Comments

feedback