CO HB1050 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Low-income Parents Ed Child Care
Title
Low-income Parents Ed Child Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1050 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1050 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1050 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1050 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1050, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1050, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1050 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1050 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1050 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1050 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1050 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1050, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1050, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1050 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1050 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-26 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |