CO HB1047 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of a metropolitan district to levy a sales tax for the purpose of providing fire protection in the areas of the district in which the tax is levied.
Title
Metropolitan District Fire Protection Sales Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1047 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1047 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1047 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1047 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor Signed | |
2019-03-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2019-01-31 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-28 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |