CO HB1047 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Interstate Medical Licensure Compact

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate Medical Licensure Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1047 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1047 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1047, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1047, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1047, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to include doctors licensed under the compact in the Michael Skolnik Medical Transparency Act of 2010. This amendment was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1047, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1047, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-08HouseGovernor Signed
2016-05-18HouseSent to the Governor
2016-05-17HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-05-09HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2016-05-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-05-05SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-05-05SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-05-03SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2016-04-21SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance
2016-04-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2016-04-14HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-12HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2016-04-11HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-04-07HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-03-24HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2016-02-04HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
2016-01-13HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B4D18CB692AE45B287257F24006450B9?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B4D18CB692AE45B287257F24006450B9/$FILE/1047_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B4D18CB692AE45B287257F24006450B9/$FILE/1047hie_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B4D18CB692AE45B287257F24006450B9/$FILE/1047fin.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B4D18CB692AE45B287257F24006450B9/$FILE/1047app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B4D18CB692AE45B287257F24006450B9/$FILE/1047_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B4D18CB692AE45B287257F24006450B9/$FILE/1047_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B4D18CB692AE45B287257F24006450B9/$FILE/1047shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B4D18CB692AE45B287257F24006450B9/$FILE/1047_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B4D18CB692AE45B287257F24006450B9/$FILE/1047hhsapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B4D18CB692AE45B287257F24006450B9/$FILE/1047_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B4D18CB692AE45B287257F24006450B9/$FILE/1047_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B4D18CB692AE45B287257F24006450B9/$FILE/1047_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FA6B0C118FA92B7087257F4F0077E2C0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FA6B0C118FA92B7087257F4F0077E2C0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E911BABD455727A487257F4F00776BE3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7AC28D9D5A90949687257F4F00764332
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/553581C06D6587E087257F4F0074DAA2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4982FDC4CBC796AC87257F8000620DF8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1F8D3C6331A6319387257F80006312A8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/6AB377213BECB5D187257F9500545AAF/$FILE/Ap14.pdf#813
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6C98403F71A12A5887257F9C0070FE99
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6C98403F71A12A5887257F9C0070FE99
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/80B5DECFC43E103287257FA800759A64
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/41CCBDC08A63346587257F9C0070EE96
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B81BEB411EE22FD987257FAA0079CC87
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F6847C9649F6A97A87257FAA0079C08C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/8F99E24A02FCBC0287257FAB004DBC4C/$FILE/jour_115.pdf#1118
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/A34FEBBD2CCA395C87257FAE0059CD33/$FILE/My09.pdf#1312
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/80B5DECFC43E103287257FA800759A64
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/41CCBDC08A63346587257F9C0070EE96
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F6847C9649F6A97A87257FAA0079C08C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B81BEB411EE22FD987257FAA0079CC87

Bill Comments

feedback