CO HB1047 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Internet Sweepstakes Cafes Simulated Gambling
Title
Internet Sweepstakes Cafes Simulated Gambling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment. Amend Amendment L.010, page 1, strike line 4, and substitute " takes effect January 1, 2016;". (Attachment A) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment R) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment R) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1047, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-03-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-05 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2015-02-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/05/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-01-29 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |