CO HB1044 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the pension plans administered by the fire and police pension association.
Title
Modify Pension Plans Administered By FPPA Fire And Police Pension Association
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Sub. Mtn: Postpone To Day (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Sub Mtn: Refer To 2nds (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1044 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.006) (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1044 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1044, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1044, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Sub. Mtn: Postpone To Day (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Sub Mtn: Refer To 2nds (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1044 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.006) (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1044 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1044, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1044, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2020-02-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-03 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |