CO HB1044 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning autocycles, and, in connection therewith, clarifying that an autocycle is a type of motorcycle and requiring autocycle drivers and passengers to use safety belts and, if applicable, child safety restraints.
Title
Autocycle Characteristics & Safety Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer House Bill 17-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer House Bill 17-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer House Bill 17-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer House Bill 17-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-03-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/13/2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |