CO HB1042 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Class Of Res Land When Res Imp Removed
Title
Class Of Res Land When Res Imp Removed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations The motion passed on a vote of 5 to 0. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations The motion passed on a vote of 5 to 0. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 11-1042 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations The motion passed on a vote of 5 to 0. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations The motion passed on a vote of 5 to 0. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 11-1042 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-04-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-18 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-13 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Lay Over Daily | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government + Appropriations | |
2011-02-23 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-22 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-21 | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-18 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-02 | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government + Appropriations |