CO HB1041 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-06 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-06 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic Death Registration System
Title
Electronic Death Registration System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1041 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1041 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1041, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Page 3, line 5, before "health" insert "Senate Health and Human Services Committee of the Senate and". Page 3, line 7, strike "its successor committee," and substitute "their successor committees" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Page 3, line 5, before "health" insert "Senate Health and Human Services Committee of the Senate and". Page 3, line 7, strike "its successor committee," and substitute "their successor committees" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1041, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1041 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment A). After a brief committee discussion, the motion was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1041 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment A). After a brief committee discussion, the motion was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1041, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved a conceptual amendment to require a report from the Department of Public Health and Environment within two years about the progress of the electronic death certificate system and if FTEs or fees could be reduced based on any savings act (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved a conceptual amendment to require a report from the Department of Public Health and Environment within two years about the progress of the electronic death certificate system and if FTEs or fees could be reduced based on any savings act (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1041, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1041 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1041 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1041, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Page 3, line 5, before "health" insert "Senate Health and Human Services Committee of the Senate and". Page 3, line 7, strike "its successor committee," and substitute "their successor committees" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Page 3, line 5, before "health" insert "Senate Health and Human Services Committee of the Senate and". Page 3, line 7, strike "its successor committee," and substitute "their successor committees" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1041, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1041 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment A). After a brief committee discussion, the motion was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1041 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment A). After a brief committee discussion, the motion was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1041, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved a conceptual amendment to require a report from the Department of Public Health and Environment within two years about the progress of the electronic death certificate system and if FTEs or fees could be reduced based on any savings act (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved a conceptual amendment to require a report from the Department of Public Health and Environment within two years about the progress of the electronic death certificate system and if FTEs or fees could be reduced based on any savings act (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1041, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-05-03 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Lay Over Daily | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-30 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-27 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-05 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Finance | |
2012-03-02 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services | |
2012-02-29 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-28 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-24 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-08 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-01-31 | House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Amended to Finance | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment |