CO HB1035 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning allowing certain crime victims to break their rental agreements under certain circumstances.
Title
Sex Assault And Stalking Victims May Break Leases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - House - House: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-21 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2017-04-18 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Reengrossed | |
2017-03-29 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-03-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-03-23 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/27/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-13 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |