CO HB1035 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update Crime Victim Compensation Laws
Title
Update Crime Victim Compensation Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1035 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - withdrawn COW The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1035, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - withdrawn COW The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1035, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-03-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-20 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-02-24 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/26/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-02-20 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-03 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |