CO HB1034 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update Wholesale Farm Product Commodity Marketing
Title
Update Wholesale Farm Product Commodity Marketing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1034 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1034 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1034 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1034 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1034 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1034 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1034 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-02-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2013-02-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-01-31 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-01-28 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |