CO HB1032 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning civil action remedy provisions for civil rights violations of persons with disabilities.
Title
Remedies Persons With Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1032, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment B) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1032, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1032, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment B) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1032, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-29 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-04-28 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-14 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |