CO HB1032 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Continue Forest Restoration Programs 5 Years
Title
Continue Forest Restoration Programs 5 Years
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1032 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1032 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved House Bill 12-1032 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1032 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1032 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1032 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved House Bill 12-1032 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1032 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-24 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-03-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-15 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-03-12 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Lay Over Daily | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-06 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-02 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-02-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy | |
2012-02-09 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-08 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-06 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-23 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |