CO HB1027 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the extension of the small retailer exception to the sales and use tax destination sourcing rules.
Title
Sales Tax Destination Sourcing Rules Exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1027 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1027 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1027 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1027 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Governor Signed | |
2022-01-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-01-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2022-01-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-01-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-01-20 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |