CO HB1027 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the authorization for certain alcohol license holders to offer alcohol beverages for consumption off the licensed premises, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continue Alcohol Beverage Takeout And Delivery

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Joint - CC_HB21-1027_2021A: Adopt draft conference committee report CLHB1027.001 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Not Cncr (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: MISC Recon (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House: Senate Amendments Adhere (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1027 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1027 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1027 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1027, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.001, as amended by L.004 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1027, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-22 Governor Signed
2021-06-21 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-16SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Reconsider
2021-06-07SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2021-06-07 First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
2021-06-03SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2021-06-01SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-05-27SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Adhere
2021-05-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2021-05-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-12SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-04-30SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2021-04-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-27HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-03-03HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1027
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1027_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1027_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1027_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1027_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1027_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1027_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1027_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1027_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1027_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1027_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1027_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1027_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1027_L.015.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1027_L.016.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1027_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1027_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1027_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1027_r2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1027_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1027_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fecc21d9493e99038725868d00637684-hb21-1027-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d6ec2956b20830548725869b00740113-hb21-1027-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fecc21d9493e99038725868d00637684-hb21-1027-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fecc21d9493e99038725868d00637684-hb21-1027-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fecc21d9493e99038725868d00637684-hb21-1027-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fecc21d9493e99038725868d00637684-hb21-1027-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9a29a10dcc106d93872586c0004ea8e5-hb21-1027-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9a29a10dcc106d93872586c0004ea8e5-hb21-1027-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1027vote556756
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/beee86b06b686943872586d4000230aa-hb21-1027-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cf0efc85c0a3ef59872586dc004d84bb-hb21-1027-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1027vote068c98
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1027vote079c5e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1027vote59fd33
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1027vote603f76
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1027vote541b65
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1027vote7552ad
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b2d9f85cb1fbe2ef872586ed005150d3-hb21-1027-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1027vote79d849
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1027vote79ef1c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1027vote56fc0b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1027vote570db6

Bill Comments 750

feedback