CO HB1027 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Home Kitchen Nonpotentially Hazardous Food
Title
Home Kitchen Nonpotentially Hazardous Food
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely HB 12-1027 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1027 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 006 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely HB 12-1027 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1027 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 006 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1027 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 006 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely HB 12-1027 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1027 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 006 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Postpone Indefinitely | |
2012-02-01 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy | |
2012-02-01 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-01-31 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-01-26 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development |