CO HB1027 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dept Defense Child Care Pilot Program
Title
Dept Defense Child Care Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1027 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1027 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1027 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1027 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1027 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-04 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2011-02-15 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-14 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-09 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |