CO HB1024 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of public outreach campaigns relating to wildfire risk mitigation in the wildland-urban interface, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Extend Outreach Campaigns Wildfire Risk Mitigation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 24-1024 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 24-1024 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2024-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-22 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |