CO HB1024 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Senate Committee on Transportation Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Senate Committee on Transportation Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agricultural Youth Driver's License
Title
Agricultural Youth Driver's License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone House Bill 11-1024 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone House Bill 11-1024 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone House Bill 11-1024 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone House Bill 11-1024 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1024, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1024, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1024, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone House Bill 11-1024 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone House Bill 11-1024 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone House Bill 11-1024 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1024, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1024, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1024, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Senate Committee on Transportation Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-04-11 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation | |
2011-04-08 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-07 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-01 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-11 | House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed | |
2011-01-26 | House Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation + Appropriations |