CO HB1022 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that the department of revenue issue a request for information for an electronic sales and use tax simplification system.
Title
DOR Department Of Revenue Issue Sales Tax Request For Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1022 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1022 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1022 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1022 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Governor Signed | |
2018-02-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-01-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-18 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |