CO HB1022 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Seller Financing Of Real Property
Title
Seller Financing Of Real Property
Sponsors
Sen. John Morse [D] | Sen. Ray Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1022 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1022 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1022 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1022 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1022 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-02-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-02-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-02-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-28 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology | |
2011-01-26 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-01-25 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-01-20 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development |