CO HB1021 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conform Statutory Court Dates To 7-day Intervals
Title
Conform Statutory Court Dates To 7-day Intervals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1021 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1021 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1021 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1021 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1021 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-03-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-05 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-01-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-01-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-01-22 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |