CO HB1014 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Hearing: May 1 in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Hearing: May 1 in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the elimination of a judicially created requirement that a significant number of consumers be harmed before remedies may be available under the "Colorado Consumer Protection Act".
Title
Deceptive Trade Practice Significant Impact Standard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 15 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 17 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1014 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 15 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 17 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1014 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-02-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |