CO HB1014 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child Care Contrib Income Tax Credit
Title
Child Care Contrib Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer to Finance Committee as amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer to Finance Committee as amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer to Finance Committee as amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer to Finance Committee as amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer to Finance Committee as amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1014, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-11 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Re-Refer Amended to Finance | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-06 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-05-05 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance | |
2011-05-04 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-03 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-03 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-16 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |