CO HB1013 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the division of a domestic stock insurer into multiple resulting domestic stock insurers, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Division Of Domestic Stock Insurer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1013 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1013 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1013, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1013, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17 Governor Signed
2021-05-11 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-05-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-03-30SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2021-03-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-03-26HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-02-24HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1013
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1013_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1013_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1013_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1013_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1013_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1013_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1013_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1013_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1013_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1013_hs2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1013_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/09d178905812632887258686005da87b-hb21-1013-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/09d178905812632887258686005da87b-hb21-1013-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9f69dbbdf76cba6c872586a4004d7bad-hb21-1013-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9f69dbbdf76cba6c872586a4004d7bad-hb21-1013-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1013vote5e5e55
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1adf09f3ecd37845872586b7006ca5eb-hb21-1013-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ee4cf99a81ecc644872586c0004d3e7e-hb21-1013-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1013vote5a926e

Bill Comments 750

feedback