CO HB1004 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a transfer from the general fund to the Colorado DRIVES vehicle services account in the highway users tax fund.
Title
Driver License Fee Reduction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.009) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.009) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-23 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-01 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |