CO HB1004 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a temporary deduction from state net taxable sales for certain retailers in the state in order to allow such retailers to retain the resulting sales tax collected as assistance for lost revenue as a result of the economic disruptions due to the presence of coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19) in Colorado.
Title
Qualified Retailer Retain Sales Tax For Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20B-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20B-1004 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20B-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20B-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.001) (Y: 28 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-11-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 27 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-12-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20B-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20B-1004 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20B-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20B-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.001) (Y: 28 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-11-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 27 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | Governor Signed | |
2020-12-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-12-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-12-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-12-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-12-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-11-30 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-11-30 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-11-30 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-11-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |