CO HB1003 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the conduct of legislative proceedings during a declared disaster emergency.
Title
Legislative Proceedings During Disaster Emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1003 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1003 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.001) (Y: 26 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 20 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-01-13 - House - House State, Civic, Military and Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1003 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1003 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1003 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1003 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.001) (Y: 26 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 20 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-01-13 - House - House State, Civic, Military and Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1003 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1003 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-20 | Governor Signed | |
2021-01-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-01-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-01-15 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-01-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-01-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-01-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-01-13 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |