CO HB1001 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning nicotine product regulations, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nicotine Product Regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.033) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1001 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1001 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.016) (Y: 27 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1001 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1001, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1001, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-14 Governor Signed
2020-07-02 Sent to the Governor
2020-07-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-07-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-12SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-08SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2020-06-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-04SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-02SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-05-26SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-03-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2020-03-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-09HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-03-06HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-03-06HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-03-02HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-02-12HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Finance
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1001
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1001_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1001_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1001_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1001_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1001_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1001_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d712c2be98af33e18725850d000a037b-hb20-1001-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d712c2be98af33e18725850d000a037b-hb20-1001-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d712c2be98af33e18725850d000a037b-hb20-1001-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d712c2be98af33e18725850d000a037b-hb20-1001-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d712c2be98af33e18725850d000a037b-hb20-1001-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d712c2be98af33e18725850d000a037b-hb20-1001-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c09ffa6702d2bea78725851f007b6cd9-hb20-1001-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bbc5cd8eb0eb1dd7872585230053fdf8-hb20-1001-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bbc5cd8eb0eb1dd7872585230053fdf8-hb20-1001-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1001vote63e736
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1001vote53f493
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2035ff02324e79de872585740074a209-hb20-1001-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/560fe0b44e2e38878725857b004ab58b-hb20-1001-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1001vote69a86d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1001vote6125ab
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1001vote60fc11
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1001vote10dc43
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1001vote10fd8f

Bill Comments

feedback