CO HB1001 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability of an employee of an employer who employs at least fifty employees to take up to eighteen hours of leave from work for purposes of attending his or her child's academic activities.
Title
Employee Leave Attend Child's Academic Activities
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Buckner [D] | Sen. Andy Kerr [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1001 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1001 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1001 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1001 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1001 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-02-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-09 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-06 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |