CA SR96 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 1. Page 5028.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 1. Page 5028.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Soledad Canyon
Title
Relative to Soledad Canyon
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR96 Wilk et al (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 1. Page 5028.) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |