CA SR79 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3687.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3687.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Women’s History Month.
Title
Relative to Women’s History Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Special Consent SR79 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3687.) |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |