CA SR66 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 3117.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 3117.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reproductive health.
Title
Relative to reproductive health.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Sen. Maria Durazo [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] |
Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR66 Leyva et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 3117.) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3088.) (January 14). |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |