CA SR38 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1384.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1384.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to childhood apraxia of speech.
Title
Relative to childhood apraxia of speech.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent SR38 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1384.) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |