CA SR15 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-15 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1855.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-15 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1855.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Division of Ratepayer Advocates
Title
Relative to the Division of Ratepayer Advocates
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR15 Beall (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-15 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1855.) |
2013-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 1705.) (July 2). |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Set for hearing July 2. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |