CA SR14 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 304.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 304.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 50th Anniversary of Bloody Sunday and the Selma Voting Rights Movement
Title
Relative to the 50th Anniversary of Bloody Sunday and the Selma Voting Rights Movement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR14 Hall (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 304.) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |