CA SR112 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4462.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR112 Allen et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4462.)
2018-05-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-05-23SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-16SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback