CA SJR23 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Interim Consolidated Storage Act of 2016.
Title
Interim Consolidated Storage Act of 2016: San Onofre
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - Assembly - SJR 23 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR23 Bates (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR23 Bates (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9 a.m. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5487.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | June 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3709.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3594.) (April 19). |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |