CA SJR23 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to research for mitochondrial disease.
Title
Mitochondrial disease: federal support for research.
Sponsors
Sen. Elaine Alquist [D] | Sen. Dave Cox [R] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Abel Maldonado [R] |
Sen. Gloria McLeod [D] | Sen. Joseph Simitian [D] | Sen. Tony Strickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR23 Simitian (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Assembly - SJR 23 Simitian Senate Third Reading By MONNING (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR23 Simitian (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Assembly - SJR 23 Simitian Senate Third Reading By MONNING (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR23 Simitian (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-07 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2010-08-27 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4973.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-02 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-02 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 3. Page 6001.) To Senate. | |
2010-06-23 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |
2010-06-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-05-20 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-05-10 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-10 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3478.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-06 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3466.) To Third Reading. | |
2010-04-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing May 5. | |
2010-03-11 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |