CA SJR2 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to climate change and fossil fuels.
Title
Climate change: Fossil Fuel Non-Proliferation Treaty.
Sponsors
Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Asm. Damon Connolly [D] |
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-01 - Assembly - SJR 2 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR2 Gonzalez et al (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR2 Gonzalez et al (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-08 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2023-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 50. Noes 14. Page 2883.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 10). |
2023-07-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1072.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 794.) (April 19). |
2023-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |