CA SJR12 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (April 15).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (April 15).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to oil and gas leases.
Title
Oil and gas leases: bankruptcy.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (April 15). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |