CA SJR12 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
Pending: Assembly Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the United States-Mexico-Canada Agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The United States-Mexico-Canada Agreement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR12 Grove (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-29 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2019-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-08-30SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 26. Noes 2. Page 2326.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-08-29SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2320.) (August 29).
2019-08-29SenateSet for hearing August 29.
2019-08-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-08-14SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback