CA SJR11 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the United States Postal Service.
Title
United States Postal Service.
Sponsors
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] |
Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] |
Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - SJR 11 Leyva Senate Third Reading By DODD (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-25 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR11 Leyva (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-25 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR11 Leyva (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-18 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:15 a.m. (Corrected September 16). |
2015-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 3178.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 11). |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-08-25 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1985.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | Set for hearing July 13. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4. Page 1704.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Set for hearing June 29. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |