CA SCR67 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-18-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-18-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Black History Month.
Title
Black History Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Assembly - SCR 67 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR67 Bradford et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR67 Bradford et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-04-19 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | |
2022-04-04 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4115.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 24). |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2986.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |