CA SCR61 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to sister state relationships with Ethiopian regional states.
Title
Sister state relationships with Ethiopian regional states.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Skinner. |
2019-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SCR61 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SCR61 |