CA SCR38 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-16-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-16-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month.
Title
Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-08 - Assembly - SCR 38 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR38 Pan (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR38 Pan (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | |
2021-07-12 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2280.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1036.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |